Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB594 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 11, 2015      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB594 by Israel (Relating to toll rates for certain vehicles traveling on State Highway 130.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB594, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($37,469,218) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 11, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB594 by Israel (Relating to toll rates for certain vehicles traveling on State Highway 130.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB594 by Israel (Relating to toll rates for certain vehicles traveling on State Highway 130.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB594 by Israel (Relating to toll rates for certain vehicles traveling on State Highway 130.), As Introduced

HB594 by Israel (Relating to toll rates for certain vehicles traveling on State Highway 130.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB594, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($37,469,218) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB594, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($37,469,218) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($18,734,609)   2017 ($18,734,609)   2018 ($18,734,609)   2019 ($18,734,609)   2020 ($18,734,609)    


2016 ($18,734,609)
2017 ($18,734,609)
2018 ($18,734,609)
2019 ($18,734,609)
2020 ($18,734,609)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2016 ($18,734,609)   2017 ($18,734,609)   2018 ($18,734,609)   2019 ($18,734,609)   2020 ($18,734,609)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2016 ($18,734,609)   2017 ($18,734,609)   2018 ($18,734,609)   2019 ($18,734,609)   2020 ($18,734,609)  


2016 ($18,734,609)
2017 ($18,734,609)
2018 ($18,734,609)
2019 ($18,734,609)
2020 ($18,734,609)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to require the Texas Transportation Commission (TTC) and the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT), not later than January 1, 2016, to develop a program to discount or adjust toll rates for a vehicle or combination of vehicles with three or more axles traveling on Segments 1-4 of State Highway 130. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015.

Methodology

Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT, it is assumed the TTC would authorize and implement a discount program for a vehicle or combination of vehicles with three or more axles, under which such vehicles would be charged a discounted toll rate equal to the toll for a two axle vehicle traveling on Segments 1-4 of State Highway 130 on the Central Texas Turnpike System (CTTS). TxDOT reports that average toll transaction rates are $6.12 for a four axle vehicle/combination and $2.04 for a two axle vehicles. Therefore, it is assumed the average toll transaction discount would be $4.08 for a four axle vehicle/combination. Based on the analysis provided by TxDOT, it is assumed four axle vehicle/combination usage of the toll facility would result in approximately 4.6 million discounted transactions per year, which would result in cumulative toll discount of $18.7 million per year. For the purposes of this analysis, it is assumed the discount program would be effective on September 1, 2015. Because TxDOT is required to consider the requirements of toll project bond covenants when adopting toll collection and enforcement policies, TxDOT would be required to reimburse the CTTS for the difference in toll revenue resulting from a toll discount on SH 130, Segments 1-4. For the purposes of this analysis, it is assumed an appropriation of General Revenue would be made to TxDOT to reimburse CTTS for the revenue loss associated with the toll discount (estimated to be $18.7 million each year).

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 601 Department of Transportation

601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: UP, AG, NV, TG

 UP, AG, NV, TG