Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB663 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2015

                    By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 663
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 663 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 207 in
 Armstrong County as the William Hamblen Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.106.  WILLIAM HAMBLEN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a) The
 portion of State Highway 207 in Armstrong County between its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 2272 and Farm-to-Market Road
 285 is designated as the William Hamblen Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the William Hamblen Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *