Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB671 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 671
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an intercollegiate athletics fee at Stephen F. Austin
 State University; authorizing imposition of a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.5202 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.5202.  INTERCOLLEGIATE ATHLETICS FEE; STEPHEN F.
 AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY. (a) The board of regents of Stephen F.
 Austin State University may charge each student enrolled at the
 university an intercollegiate athletics fee in an initial amount
 not to exceed $10 per semester credit hour for each semester or
 summer session. The amount of the fee may be increased only as
 provided by Subsection (f).
 (b)  The board of regents may prorate the amount of the fee
 for a summer session.
 (c)  A student enrolled in more than 15 semester credit hours
 shall pay the fee in an amount equal to the amount imposed on a
 student enrolled in 15 semester credit hours during the same
 semester or session.
 (d)  Revenue from the fee charged under this section may be
 used only for financing, constructing, operating, maintaining, or
 improving an athletic facility or for operating an intercollegiate
 athletics program at the university.
 (e)  The fee may not be charged unless approved by a majority
 vote of the students enrolled at the university who participate in a
 general student election held for that purpose.
 (f)  The amount of the fee per semester credit hour may be
 increased from one academic year to the next only if approved by a
 majority vote of the students participating in a general student
 election held for that purpose or, if the amount of the increase
 does not exceed five percent, by a majority vote of the legislative
 body of the student government of the university.
 (g)  The chief fiscal officer of the university shall collect
 the fee and shall deposit the revenue from the fee in an account to
 be known as the intercollegiate athletics fee account.
 (h)  A fee charged under this section is not considered in
 determining the maximum amount of student services fees that may be
 charged each student enrolled at the university under Section
 54.503.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *