By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 679 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 4; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV SchwertnerX KolkhorstX CampbellX EstesX PerryX RodrÃguezX TaylorofCollinX UrestiX ZaffiriniX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study on homeless youth. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by adding Subchapter OO to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS YOUTH Sec. 2306.1101. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "homeless youth" means a person who is younger than 19 years of age, including a migratory child, as defined by Section 1309, Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 6399), who: (1) lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime residence, including a person who is: (A) temporarily allowed to stay in the house of another person due to loss of housing; (B) temporarily living in a motel or hotel; (C) living in an emergency shelter; (D) abandoned in a hospital; or (E) awaiting foster care placement; (2) has a primary nighttime residence that is a public or private place not designed or ordinarily used as a regular sleeping accommodation for humans; or (3) is living in a car, park, other public space, abandoned building, substandard housing, bus or train station, or similar setting. Sec. 2306.1102. STUDY ON HOMELESS YOUTH. (a) The department, in conjunction with other members of the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless established under Subchapter KK, shall conduct a study on homeless youth. (b) In conducting the study, the department shall: (1) collect data on the number of homeless youth in this state; (2) examine the needs of homeless youth and the degree to which current programs are meeting those needs; (3) identify any sources of funding that might be available to provide services to homeless youth; and (4) develop a strategic plan establishing steps to be taken and timelines for reducing youth homelessness in this state. (c) The department shall submit a report on the study to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016. The report must include a summary of the information resulting from the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to or otherwise assist homeless youth. (d) This section expires September 1, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *