Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB679 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 679


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on homeless youth.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter OO to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS YOUTH
 Sec. 2306.1101.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "homeless
 youth" means a person who is younger than 19 years of age, including
 a migratory child, as defined by Section 1309, Elementary and
 Secondary Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 6399), who:
 (1)  lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime
 residence, including a person who is:
 (A)  living in an emergency shelter;
 (B)  abandoned in a hospital; or
 (C
 )  awaiting foster care placement;
 (2)  has a primary nighttime residence that is a public
 or private place not designed or ordinarily used as a regular
 sleeping accommodation for humans; or
 (3)  is living in a car, park, other public space,
 abandoned building, substandard housing, bus or train station, or
 similar setting.
 Sec. 2306.1102.  STUDY ON HOMELESS YOUTH. (a)  The
 department, in conjunction with other members of the Texas
 Interagency Council for the Homeless established under Subchapter
 KK, shall conduct a study on homeless youth.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the department shall:
 (1)  collect data on the number of homeless youth in
 this state;
 (2)  examine the needs of homeless youth and the degree
 to which current programs are meeting those needs;
 (3)  identify any sources of funding that might be
 available to provide services to homeless youth; and
 (4)  develop a strategic plan establishing steps to be
 taken and timelines for reducing youth homelessness in this state.
 (c)  The department shall submit a report on the study to the
 legislature not later than December 1, 2016.  The report must
 include a summary of the information resulting from the study and
 recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to
 or otherwise assist homeless youth.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 679 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 92, Nays 50, 3 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 679 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 110, Nays 33,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 679 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 20, Nays
 10.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor