Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB685 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Sheets (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 685
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays
 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 685 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the production of public information under the public
 information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.221, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  In addition to the methods of production described by
 Subsection (b), an officer for public information for a political
 subdivision of this state complies with Subsection (a) by referring
 a requestor to an exact Internet location or uniform resource
 locator (URL) address on a website maintained by the political
 subdivision and accessible to the public if the requested
 information is identifiable and readily available on that website.
 If the person requesting the information prefers a manner other
 than access through the URL, the political subdivision,
 notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, must supply
 the information by:
 (1)  providing the public information for inspection or
 duplication in the offices of the governmental body; or
 (2)  sending printed copies of the public information
 by first class United States mail if the person requesting the
 information requests that copies be provided and pays the postage
 and any other applicable charges that the requestor has accrued
 under Subchapter F.
 (b-2)  If an officer for public information for a political
 subdivision provides by e-mail an Internet location or uniform
 resource locator (URL) address as permitted by Subsection (b-1),
 the e-mail must contain a statement in a conspicuous font clearly
 indicating that the requestor may nonetheless access the requested
 information by inspection or duplication or by receipt through
 United States mail, as provided by Subsection (b-1).
 SECTION 2.  Section 182.052, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A governmental body as defined by Section 552.003,
 Government Code, may withhold information prohibited from being
 disclosed under this section without the necessity of requesting a
 decision from the attorney general under Subchapter G, Chapter 552,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information that is received by a governmental body or
 an officer for public information on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A request for information that was received before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the request was received, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *