Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB74 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2015

                    By: González (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 74
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 24, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 74 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain financial assistance administered by the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs in certain rural areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2306.6702(a), Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (12) and (17) to read as follows:
 (12)  "Rural area" means an area that is:
 (A)  described by Section 2306.004(28-a); or
 (B)  designated by the department as a rural area
 under Section 2306.6740.
 (17)  "Urban area" means the area that is located
 within the boundaries of a primary metropolitan statistical area or
 a metropolitan statistical area other than an area:
 (A)  described by Section 2306.004 (28-a)(B); or
 (B)  designated by the department as a rural area
 under Section 2306.6740.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6740 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6740.  DESIGNATION OF CERTAIN AREAS AS RURAL. (a)
 The department by rule shall provide for the designation by the
 department of an area located within the boundaries of a primary
 metropolitan statistical area or a metropolitan statistical area as
 a rural area under Section 2306.6702(a)(12)(B) for purposes of
 receiving housing tax credits administered by the department under
 this subchapter.
 (b)  Rules adopted under this section must ensure that any
 housing tax credits allocated to a designated rural area complies
 with any applicable federal requirements regarding that
 assistance.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *