Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB743 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huberty, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 743
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 743 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the required
 public school curriculum and to certain assessment instruments for
 public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-11), (a-12), and (a-13) to read as follows:
 (a-11)  Before an assessment instrument adopted or developed
 under Subsection (a) may be administered under that subsection, the
 assessment instrument must, on the basis of empirical evidence, be
 determined to be valid and reliable by an entity that is independent
 of the agency and of any other entity that developed the assessment
 instrument.
 (a-12)  An assessment instrument adopted or developed under
 Subsection (a) must be designed so that:
 (1)  if administered to students in grades three
 through five, 85 percent of students will be able to complete the
 assessment instrument within 120 minutes; and
 (2)  if administered to students in grades six through
 eight, 85 percent of students will be able to complete the
 assessment instrument within 180 minutes.
 (a-13)  The amount of time allowed for administration of an
 assessment instrument adopted or developed under Subsection (a) may
 not exceed eight hours, and the administration may occur on only one
 day.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0236 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0236.  STUDY OF ESSENTIAL KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS AND
 ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a) The agency shall conduct a study
 regarding the essential knowledge and skills of the required
 curriculum identified by the State Board of Education under Section
 28.002 and assessment instruments administered under Section
 39.023.
 (b)  The study must evaluate:
 (1)  the number and scope of the essential knowledge
 and skills of each subject of the required curriculum under Section
 28.002, with each essential knowledge or skill identified as a
 readiness or supporting standard, and whether the number or scope
 should be limited;
 (2)  the number and subjects of assessment instruments
 under Section 39.023 that are required to be administered to
 students in grades three through eight; and
 (3)  how assessment instruments described by
 Subdivision (2) assess standards essential for student success and
 whether the assessment instruments should also assess supporting
 standards, including analysis of:
 (A)  the portion of the essential knowledge and
 skills capable of being accurately assessed;
 (B)  the appropriate skills that can be assessed
 within the testing parameters under current law; and
 (C)  how current standards compare to those
 parameters.
 (c)  Not later than March 1, 2016, the agency shall prepare
 and submit to the State Board of Education a report concerning the
 results of the study under Subsection (b).  Not later than May 1,
 2016, the State Board of Education shall review the study and shall
 submit to the governor and each member of the legislature the
 agency's report and board recommendations regarding each issue
 evaluated under Subsection (b).
 (d)  This section expires June 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 39.0261(b) and (c), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The agency shall:
 (1)  select and approve vendors of the specific
 assessment instruments administered under this section; and
 (2)  provide reimbursement to a school district
 for [pay] all fees associated with the administration of the
 assessment instrument from funds appropriated for that purpose
 [allotted under the Foundation School Program, and the commissioner
 shall reduce the total amount of state funds allocated to each
 district from any source in the same manner described for a
 reduction in allotments under Section 42.253].
 (c)  The agency shall ensure that a school district is not
 reimbursed [vendors are not paid] under Subsection (b) for the
 administration of an assessment instrument to a student to whom the
 assessment instrument is not actually administered. The agency may
 comply with this subsection by any reasonable means, including by
 creating a refund system under which a school district [vendor]
 returns any payment made for a student who registered for the
 administration of an assessment instrument but did not appear for
 the administration.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0381 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0381.  AUDITING AND MONITORING PERFORMANCE UNDER
 CONTRACTS FOR ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a)  The agency by rule shall
 develop a comprehensive methodology for auditing and monitoring
 performance under contracts for services to develop or administer
 assessment instruments required by Section 39.023 to verify
 compliance with contractual obligations.
 (b)  The agency shall ensure that all new and renewed
 contracts described by Subsection (a) include a provision that the
 agency or a designee of the agency may conduct periodic contract
 compliance reviews, without advance notice, to monitor vendor
 performance.
 (c)  The agency shall adopt rules to administer this section.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *