Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB75 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: González (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 75
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from vehicle registration for certain
 farm vehicles owned by a farmers' cooperative society or marketing
 association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.146, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsections (e) and (h) to
 read as follows:
 (c-1)  An exemption provided by this section applies to a
 vehicle owned by a farmers' cooperative society incorporated under
 Chapter 51, Agriculture Code, or a marketing association organized
 under Chapter 52, Agriculture Code, and used by members of the
 society or association for a fee if the vehicle otherwise meets the
 requirements for the exemption.
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), this [This]
 section does not apply to a farm trailer or farm semitrailer that:
 (1)  is used for hire;
 (2)  has metal tires operating in contact with the
 highway;
 (3)  is not equipped with an adequate hitch pinned or
 locked so that it will remain securely engaged to the towing vehicle
 while in motion; or
 (4)  is not operated and equipped in compliance with
 all other law.
 (h)  A specialty license plate may not be issued under
 Subsection (a) to an owner of a vehicle described by Subsection
 (b)(1) unless the vehicle's owner provides a registration number
 issued by the comptroller under Section 151.1551, Tax Code, or the
 vehicle is owned by a farmers' cooperative society incorporated
 under Chapter 51, Agriculture Code, or a marketing association
 organized under Chapter 52, Agriculture Code.  The comptroller
 shall allow access to the online system established under Section
 151.1551(l), Tax Code, to verify a registration number provided
 under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *