Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB764 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2015

                    By: King of Taylor, et al. H.B. No. 764
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use, collection, and security of health care data
 collected by the Department of State Health Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 108.009, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The department or another entity as determined by the
 department to collect data from a provider under Subsection (a)
 shall maintain a database that does not include identifying
 information for use as authorized by law, including this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 108, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 108.0095 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.0095.  NOTIFICATION OF DATA COLLECTION. (a) A
 provider shall provide to a patient whose data is being collected
 under this chapter written notice on a form prescribed by the
 department of the collection of the patient's data for health care
 purposes.
 (b)  The notice provided under this section must include the
 name of the agency or entity receiving the data and of an individual
 within the agency or entity whom the patient may contact regarding
 the collection of data.
 (c)  The department shall include the notice required under
 this section on an existing department form and make the form
 available on the department's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  Section 108.011(d), Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt procedures to
 establish the accuracy and consistency of the public use data
 before releasing the public use data to the public. The department
 may adopt additional procedures as the department determines
 necessary. The procedures adopted under this subsection must meet
 available best practices and national standards for public research
 on and consumer use of health care data collected by governmental
 agencies.
 SECTION 4.  Section 108.013(a), Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The data received by the department under this chapter
 shall be used by the department and commission only for the benefit
 of the public. Subject to specific limitations established by this
 chapter and department rule, the department shall make
 determinations on requests for information in favor of access.
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 108, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 108.0132 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.0132.  PROHIBITED CHARGE TO CERTAIN STATE AGENCIES
 FOR DATA. The department may not charge a fee to the commission or
 any other health and human services agency for the use of any data
 collected under this chapter.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 108, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 108.0136 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.0136.  REPORT; NOTIFICATION OF CYBER ATTACK. (a)
 The department shall prepare for the commissioner an annual report
 describing the security measures taken to protect data collected
 under this chapter and any breaches, attempted cyber attacks, and
 security issues related to the data that are encountered during the
 calendar year.
 (b)  The report described by this section is not subject to
 Chapter 552, Government Code, but may be released on request to a
 member of the legislature.
 (c)  If a cyber attack occurs targeting data collected under
 this chapter, the department shall notify the Department of Public
 Safety of the State of Texas and the Federal Bureau of Investigation
 of the attack.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *