Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB77 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Gonzáles, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 77
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays
 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 77 By:  Zaffirini


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KolkhorstX
 CampbellX
 EstesX
 PerryX
 RodríguezX
 TaylorofCollinX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the Dallas Men Against Abuse program and
 other activities in the Dallas community addressing family
 violence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Program" means the Dallas Men Against Abuse
 program implemented by the City of Dallas.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY REQUIRED. (a) The Health and Human
 Services Commission, in conjunction with a statewide coalition on
 family violence, shall conduct a study of activities in the Dallas
 community addressing family violence, with a specific focus on each
 aspect of the Dallas Men Against Abuse program, to determine if any
 or all of those activities or program aspects should be implemented
 at the state level or in additional local communities or school
 districts.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the commission and the
 statewide coalition on family violence shall consult with:
 (1)  the City of Dallas Domestic Violence Task Force;
 and
 (2)  a researcher with expertise on family violence who
 is affiliated with an institution of higher education in this
 state.
 SECTION 3.  CONTENTS OF STUDY. The study must:
 (1)  examine each aspect of the program;
 (2)  evaluate the effectiveness of each aspect of the
 program and the effectiveness of other community activities that
 contributed to changes in community responses to family violence,
 based on indicators developed in consultation with family violence
 experts, including the statewide coalition on family violence
 conducting the study in conjunction with the commission and the
 researcher described by Section 2(b)(2) of this Act;
 (3)  evaluate the effectiveness of the program in
 increasing male involvement in addressing family violence;
 (4)  incorporate background information, such as the
 number of calls made to domestic violence hotlines, the number of
 prosecutions of offenses involving family violence, and the number
 of charges filed in family violence cases, to provide context for
 the issue of family violence in the Dallas community and this state;
 (5)  assess the costs associated with the program and
 other community activities addressing family violence and sources
 of funding;
 (6)  determine the feasibility of implementing any or
 all of the program aspects or other community activities addressing
 family violence at the state level or in additional local
 communities or school districts; and
 (7)  make recommendations to the legislature regarding
 implementing any or all of the program aspects or other community
 activities addressing family violence at the state level or in
 additional local communities or school districts.
 SECTION 4.  AGENCY PARTICIPATION AND COOPERATION. At the
 request of the commission, the Department of Family and Protective
 Services and each other health and human services agency under the
 authority of the commission shall participate in the study and
 provide appropriate assistance. The Texas Education Agency shall
 cooperate with the commission as necessary to enable the commission
 to assess the feasibility of implementing any or all of the program
 aspects or other community activities addressing family violence in
 school districts.
 SECTION 5.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2016, the
 commission shall submit a report to the legislature regarding the
 results of the study and the commission's recommendations regarding
 expanded implementation of any or all program aspects or other
 community activities addressing family violence.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *