Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB786 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Walle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 786
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right of a public employee to express breast milk in
 the workplace.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 6, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 619 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 619. RIGHT TO EXPRESS BREAST MILK
 IN THE WORKPLACE
 Sec. 619.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "public
 employer" means:
 (1)  a county, a municipality, or another political
 subdivision of this state, including a school district; or
 (2)  a board, a commission, an office, a department, or
 another agency in the executive, judicial, or legislative branch of
 state government, including an institution of higher education.
 Sec. 619.002.  RIGHT TO EXPRESS BREAST MILK. An employee of a
 public employer is entitled to express breast milk at the
 employee's workplace.
 Sec. 619.003.  POLICY ON EXPRESSING BREAST MILK. (a) A
 public employer shall develop a written policy on the expression of
 breast milk by employees under this chapter.
 (b)  A policy developed under Subsection (a) must state that
 the public employer shall:
 (1)  support the practice of expressing breast milk;
 and
 (2)  make reasonable accommodations for the needs of
 employees who express breast milk.
 Sec. 619.004.  PUBLIC EMPLOYER RESPONSIBILITIES. A public
 employer shall:
 (1)  provide a reasonable amount of break time for an
 employee to express breast milk each time the employee has need to
 express the milk; and
 (2)  provide a place, other than a bathroom, that is
 shielded from view and free from intrusion from other employees and
 the public where the employee can express breast milk.
 Sec. 619.005.  DISCRIMINATION PROHIBITED. A public employer
 may not suspend or terminate the employment of, or otherwise
 discriminate against, an employee because the employee has asserted
 the employee's rights under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *