Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB790 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 8, 2015      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB790 by Burkett (Relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill requires the Texas A&M Transportation Institute to conduct a study assessing the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on highways that are part of the state highway system and toll roads or turnpikes under the jurisdiction of a toll project entity.  The agency is to submit a report on the study's results and any recommendations to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the Legislature with jurisdiction over transportation matters no later than November 1, 2016.  The legislation would take effect on September 1, 2015, or immediately with a two-thirds vote in each house of the Legislature, and would expire August 31, 2017.  It is assumed the agency could implement the provisions of the legislation within existing resources.   Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:601 Department of Transportation, 727 Texas A&M Transportation Institute   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, DEH    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 8, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB790 by Burkett (Relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB790 by Burkett (Relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB790 by Burkett (Relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB790 by Burkett (Relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill requires the Texas A&M Transportation Institute to conduct a study assessing the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on highways that are part of the state highway system and toll roads or turnpikes under the jurisdiction of a toll project entity.  The agency is to submit a report on the study's results and any recommendations to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the Legislature with jurisdiction over transportation matters no later than November 1, 2016.  The legislation would take effect on September 1, 2015, or immediately with a two-thirds vote in each house of the Legislature, and would expire August 31, 2017.  It is assumed the agency could implement the provisions of the legislation within existing resources.  

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 601 Department of Transportation, 727 Texas A&M Transportation Institute

601 Department of Transportation, 727 Texas A&M Transportation Institute

LBB Staff: UP, AG, DEH

 UP, AG, DEH