H.B. No. 790 AN ACT relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Texas A&M Transportation Institute shall conduct a study assessing the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on highways that are part of the state highway system and toll roads or turnpikes under the jurisdiction of a toll project entity as defined by Section 372.001, Transportation Code. The study must include: (1) an analysis of the process and methodology used by the Texas Department of Transportation or toll project entity for selecting and implementing sound mitigation measures, including factors that affect the process and how outcomes are determined; (2) an analysis of whether any kind of live testing is conducted at any point to determine the actual traffic noise level for neighboring properties; (3) an evaluation of the effectiveness of the process and methodology described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection in reducing the traffic noise level for neighboring properties; and (4) an evaluation of the effectiveness of implemented sound mitigation measures in reducing the traffic noise level for neighboring properties. (b) Not later than November 1, 2016, the Texas A&M Transportation Institute shall submit a report on the results of the study and any recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over transportation matters. (c) This Act expires August 31, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 790 was passed by the House on May 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 6, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 790 was passed by the Senate on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor