Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB796 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2015

                    By: Geren, Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 796
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of certain insurance coverage and the
 performance of related risk management services for the Texas State
 University System and the component institutions of that system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 412.011, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c) and (e) and adding Subsection (j) to read
 as follows:
 (c)  The office shall:
 (1)  perform risk management for each state agency
 subject to this chapter, except to any extent limited by Subsection
 (j) [Chapter 412]; and
 (2)  purchase insurance coverage under any line of
 insurance other than health or life insurance, including liability
 insurance authorized under Chapter 612, Government Code, for a
 state agency subject to Chapter 501, except for:
 (A)  an institution subject to Section 501.022; or
 (B)  the Texas State University System or a
 component institution of that system[, under any line of insurance
 other than health or life insurance, including liability insurance
 authorized under Chapter 612, Government Code].
 (e)  A state agency subject to Chapter 501, except for an
 institution subject to Section 501.022 or the Texas State
 University System or a component institution of that system, may
 not purchase property, casualty, or liability insurance coverage
 without the approval of the board.
 (j)  The Texas State University System or a component
 institution of that system shall perform risk management services
 related to insurance coverage purchased by the system or
 institution without board approval.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *