Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB798 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 19, 2015      TO: Honorable Tracy O. King, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB798 by González, Mary (relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Agriculture Code requiring the Texas Department of Agriculture to study issues relating to the sale or transportation of desert plants. TDA would be required to appoint a task force by December 1, 2015 to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants from private property. The task force would be required to submit a report by December 1, 2016, that includes recommendations for legislation to regulate the sale of desert plants and prevent the theft of desert plants from private property.  Section 12.052 would expire December 31, 2016. This estimate assumes the agency could absorb any study costs within existing resources, and no significant fiscal impact to the state is anticipated.  Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 551 Department of Agriculture   LBB Staff:  UP, TB, SZ, MW, JP    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 19, 2015





  TO: Honorable Tracy O. King, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB798 by González, Mary (relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Tracy O. King, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB798 by González, Mary (relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Tracy O. King, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock 

 Honorable Tracy O. King, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB798 by González, Mary (relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB798 by González, Mary (relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Agriculture Code requiring the Texas Department of Agriculture to study issues relating to the sale or transportation of desert plants. TDA would be required to appoint a task force by December 1, 2015 to study methods to prevent the theft of desert plants from private property. The task force would be required to submit a report by December 1, 2016, that includes recommendations for legislation to regulate the sale of desert plants and prevent the theft of desert plants from private property.  Section 12.052 would expire December 31, 2016. This estimate assumes the agency could absorb any study costs within existing resources, and no significant fiscal impact to the state is anticipated. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 551 Department of Agriculture

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 551 Department of Agriculture

LBB Staff: UP, TB, SZ, MW, JP

 UP, TB, SZ, MW, JP