Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB804 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 804
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the forms of payment that the operator of a vehicle
 storage facility must accept.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2303.159, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The operator of a vehicle storage facility shall accept
 each of the following forms of payment [by an electronic check,
 debit card, or credit card] for any charge associated with delivery
 or storage of a vehicle:
 (1)  cash;
 (2)  debit card; and
 (3)  credit card.
 (a-1)  The operator of a vehicle storage facility shall
 conspicuously post a sign that states:  "This vehicle storage
 facility must accept payment by cash, [an electronic check,] credit
 card, and [or] debit card for any fee or charge associated with
 delivery or storage of a vehicle."  The operator of a vehicle
 storage facility may not refuse to release a vehicle based on the
 inability of the facility to accept payment by [electronic check,]
 debit card[,] or credit card of a fee or charge associated with
 delivery or storage of the vehicle unless the operator, through no
 fault of the operator, is unable to accept the [electronic check,]
 debit card[,] or credit card because of a power outage or a machine
 malfunction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *