Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB824 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 824


 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages to customers of a
 package store during certain hours.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 22, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 22.17 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.17.  SALE TO CUSTOMER IN STORE AT CLOSING.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, if a customer has
 entered a package store during hours in which the package store may
 sell alcohol and is still in the store at the time the hours of legal
 sale end, the permittee may allow the customer to remain in the
 store for a reasonable amount of time to finish shopping, and the
 permittee may sell an alcoholic beverage to that customer even
 though the sale occurs after the designated end of the hours of
 legal sale.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 824 was passed by the House on April
 23, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 824 on May 29, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 824 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 824 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays
 3; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 824 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor