Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB833 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 833
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain holders of motor home manufacturer's and
 dealer's licenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2301.476(h), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (h)  A person who on June 7, 1995, held both a motor home
 manufacturer's license and a motor home dealer's license issued
 under this chapter may:
 (1)  [continue to] hold:
 (A)  a motor home manufacturer's license;
 (B)  a general distinguishing number issued under
 Chapter 503, Transportation Code; and
 (C)  not more than two franchised dealer's
 licenses [both licenses]; and
 (2)  operate as both a manufacturer and dealer of motor
 homes but of no other type of vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *