Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB9 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Flynn, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 9
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to member contributions to the Employees Retirement System
 of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 815.402(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 813.201, each payroll
 period, each department or agency of the state shall cause to be
 deducted from each member's compensation a contribution of:
 (1)  9.5 [6.6 percent of the compensation if the member
 is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after
 August 31, 2013, and before September 1, 2014;
 [(2)     6.9 percent of the compensation if the member is
 not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August
 31, 2014, and before September 1, 2015;
 [(3)  7.2] percent of the compensation if the member is
 not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August
 31, 2015, and before September 1, 2017 [2016];
 (2)  [(4)     7.5 percent of the compensation if the
 member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered
 after August 31, 2016;
 [(5)]  for service by a member who is not a member of
 the legislature rendered on or after September 1, 2017, the lesser
 of:
 (A)  9.5 [7.5] percent of the member's annual
 compensation; or
 (B)  a percentage of the member's annual
 compensation equal to 9.5 [7.5] percent reduced by one-tenth of one
 percent for each one-tenth of one percent that the state
 contribution rate for the fiscal year to which the service relates
 is less than the state contribution rate established for the 2017
 [2015] fiscal year; or
 (3)  9.5 [(6) eight] percent of the compensation if the
 member is a member of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *