H.B. No. 9 AN ACT rela ting to the Employees Retirement System of Texas. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 812.003(a), (d), and (e), Government Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Except as provided by Subsection [Subsections] (b) [and (d)], membership in the employee class of the retirement system includes all employees and appointed officers of every department, commission, board, agency, or institution of the state except: (1) independent contractors and their employees performing work for the state; and (2) persons disqualified from membership under Section 812.201. (d) Membership in the employee class begins on the [91st day after the] first day a person is employed or holds office. (e) A person who is reemployed or who again holds office after withdrawing contributions under Subchapter B for previous service credited in the employee class begins membership in the employee class on the [91st day after the] first day the person is reemployed or again holds office. SECTION 2. Section 813.514, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: (a) This section applies only to a member who became a member before September 1, 2015. (a-1) A member may establish service credit under this section in the employee class only for service performed during a 90-day waiting period to become a member after beginning employment or holding office. SECTION 3. Section 815.402(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Except as provided by Section 813.201, each payroll period, each department or agency of the state shall cause to be deducted from each member's compensation a contribution of: (1) 9.5 [6.6 percent of the compensation if the member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31, 2013, and before September 1, 2014; [(2) 6.9 percent of the compensation if the member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31, 2014, and before September 1, 2015; [(3) 7.2] percent of the compensation if the member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31, 2015, and before September 1, 2017 [2016]; (2) [(4) 7.5 percent of the compensation if the member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31, 2016; [(5)] for service by a member who is not a member of the legislature rendered on or after September 1, 2017, the lesser of: (A) 9.5 [7.5] percent of the member's annual compensation; or (B) a percentage of the member's annual compensation equal to 9.5 [7.5] percent reduced by one-tenth of one percent for each one-tenth of one percent that the state contribution rate for the fiscal year to which the service relates is less than the state contribution rate established for the 2017 [2015] fiscal year; or (3) 9.5 [(6) eight] percent of the compensation if the member is a member of the legislature. SECTION 4. Section 812.003(f), Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 9 was passed by the House on April 14, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 9 on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 9 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor