Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB9 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 9


 AN ACT
 rela
 ting to the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 812.003(a), (d), and (e), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection [Subsections] (b) [and
 (d)], membership in the employee class of the retirement system
 includes all employees and appointed officers of every department,
 commission, board, agency, or institution of the state except:
 (1)  independent contractors and their employees
 performing work for the state; and
 (2)  persons disqualified from membership under
 Section 812.201.
 (d)  Membership in the employee class begins on the [91st day
 after the] first day a person is employed or holds office.
 (e)  A person who is reemployed or who again holds office
 after withdrawing contributions under Subchapter B for previous
 service credited in the employee class begins membership in the
 employee class on the [91st day after the] first day the person is
 reemployed or again holds office.
 SECTION 2.  Section 813.514, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a member who became a
 member before September 1, 2015.
 (a-1)  A member may establish service credit under this
 section in the employee class only for service performed during a
 90-day waiting period to become a member after beginning employment
 or holding office.
 SECTION 3.  Section 815.402(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 813.201, each payroll
 period, each department or agency of the state shall cause to be
 deducted from each member's compensation a contribution of:
 (1)  9.5 [6.6 percent of the compensation if the member
 is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after
 August 31, 2013, and before September 1, 2014;
 [(2)     6.9 percent of the compensation if the member is
 not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August
 31, 2014, and before September 1, 2015;
 [(3)  7.2] percent of the compensation if the member is
 not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August
 31, 2015, and before September 1, 2017 [2016];
 (2)  [(4)     7.5 percent of the compensation if the
 member is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered
 after August 31, 2016;
 [(5)]  for service by a member who is not a member of
 the legislature rendered on or after September 1, 2017, the lesser
 of:
 (A)  9.5 [7.5] percent of the member's annual
 compensation; or
 (B)  a percentage of the member's annual
 compensation equal to 9.5 [7.5] percent reduced by one-tenth of one
 percent for each one-tenth of one percent that the state
 contribution rate for the fiscal year to which the service relates
 is less than the state contribution rate established for the 2017
 [2015] fiscal year; or
 (3)  9.5 [(6) eight] percent of the compensation if the
 member is a member of the legislature.
 SECTION 4.  Section 812.003(f), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 9 was passed by the House on April 14,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 9 on May 26, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 9 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor