Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB909 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2015

                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 909
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the tasting of alcoholic beverages by students enrolled
 in certain courses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 106.05(b), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A minor may possess an alcoholic beverage:
 (1)  while in the course and scope of the minor's
 employment if the minor is an employee of a licensee or permittee
 and the employment is not prohibited by this code;
 (2)  if the minor is in the visible presence of his
 adult parent, guardian, or spouse, or other adult to whom the minor
 has been committed by a court; [or]
 (3)  if the minor is under the immediate supervision of
 a commissioned peace officer engaged in enforcing the provisions of
 this code; or
 (4)  if the beverage is lawfully provided to the minor
 under Section 106.16.
 SECTION 2.  Section 106.06(b), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A person may purchase an alcoholic beverage for or give
 an alcoholic beverage to a minor if the person is:
 (1)  [he is] the minor's adult parent, guardian, or
 spouse, or an adult in whose custody the minor has been committed by
 a court, and [he] is visibly present when the minor possesses or
 consumes the alcoholic beverage; or
 (2)  a person lawfully providing an alcoholic beverage
 to a minor under Section 106.16.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 106, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 106.16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 106.16.  EXCEPTION FOR CERTAIN COURSE WORK. (a) In
 this section:
 (1)  "Career school or college" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 132.001, Education Code.
 (2)  "Taste" means to draw a beverage into the mouth
 without swallowing or otherwise consuming the beverage.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a minor may taste an
 alcoholic beverage if:
 (1)  the minor:
 (A)  is at least 18 years old; and
 (B)  is enrolled:
 (i)  as a student at a public or private
 institution of higher education or a career school or college that
 offers a program in culinary arts, viticulture, enology or wine
 technology, brewing or beer technology, or distilled spirits
 production or technology; and
 (ii)  in a course that is part of a program
 described by Subparagraph (i);
 (2)  the beverage is tasted for educational purposes as
 part of the curriculum for the course described by Subdivision
 (1)(B)(ii);
 (3)  the beverage is not purchased by the minor; and
 (4)  the service and tasting of the beverage is
 supervised by a faculty or staff member who is at least 21 years of
 age.
 (c)  A public or private institution of higher education or a
 career school or college is not required to hold a license or permit
 to engage in the activities authorized under this section.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *