Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB923 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 923


 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of 36th Infantry Division specialty
 license plates and souvenir license plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.009, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  On request, the Texas Military Department, as defined
 by Section 437.001, Government Code, shall issue a souvenir version
 of the specialty license plate described by Section 504.320.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.320 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.320.  36TH INFANTRY DIVISION. The department shall
 issue specialty license plates for persons who have served in the
 36th Infantry Division of the Texas Army National Guard. The
 license plates must include the 36th Infantry Division emblem and
 must include the words "36th Infantry Division" at the bottom of
 each plate.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 923 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 923 on May 18, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 923 on May 28, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 923 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 923 on May 29, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor