Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB966 Senate Amendments Printing / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 26, 2015      TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB966 by Crownover (Relating to the creation of an optional consumer-directed health plan for certain individuals eligible to participate in the group benefits program provided under the Texas Employees Group Benefits Act and their qualified dependents.), As Passed 2nd House    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Insurance Code to require the Employees Retirement System to establish a consumer-directed health plan, which would include a high deductible health plan and a health savings account as an option for Group Benefit Program participants. Participation in the program would be voluntary. The bill directs the state to contribute the difference, if any, between the full state contribution for HealthSelect and the coverage cost of the high deductible plan, to a health savings account. ERS reports that these amounts would be adjusted to neutralize any additional cost to the state. The bill would require ERS to conduct a study on the implementation of the consumer-directed health plan, with the results of the study reported to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House, and all members of the legislature by January 1, 2020. ERS indicates that any additional administrative costs associated with tracking and reporting on the usage and cost-effectiveness of the consumer-directed health plan, as well as performing the study, could be absorbed within existing resources. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015, with coverage beginning September 1, 2016. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:327 Employees Retirement System   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, EMo, KFa, EP    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 26, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB966 by Crownover (Relating to the creation of an optional consumer-directed health plan for certain individuals eligible to participate in the group benefits program provided under the Texas Employees Group Benefits Act and their qualified dependents.), As Passed 2nd House  

TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB966 by Crownover (Relating to the creation of an optional consumer-directed health plan for certain individuals eligible to participate in the group benefits program provided under the Texas Employees Group Benefits Act and their qualified dependents.), As Passed 2nd House

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB966 by Crownover (Relating to the creation of an optional consumer-directed health plan for certain individuals eligible to participate in the group benefits program provided under the Texas Employees Group Benefits Act and their qualified dependents.), As Passed 2nd House

HB966 by Crownover (Relating to the creation of an optional consumer-directed health plan for certain individuals eligible to participate in the group benefits program provided under the Texas Employees Group Benefits Act and their qualified dependents.), As Passed 2nd House



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Insurance Code to require the Employees Retirement System to establish a consumer-directed health plan, which would include a high deductible health plan and a health savings account as an option for Group Benefit Program participants. Participation in the program would be voluntary. The bill directs the state to contribute the difference, if any, between the full state contribution for HealthSelect and the coverage cost of the high deductible plan, to a health savings account. ERS reports that these amounts would be adjusted to neutralize any additional cost to the state. The bill would require ERS to conduct a study on the implementation of the consumer-directed health plan, with the results of the study reported to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House, and all members of the legislature by January 1, 2020. ERS indicates that any additional administrative costs associated with tracking and reporting on the usage and cost-effectiveness of the consumer-directed health plan, as well as performing the study, could be absorbed within existing resources. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015, with coverage beginning September 1, 2016.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 327 Employees Retirement System

327 Employees Retirement System

LBB Staff: UP, AG, EMo, KFa, EP

 UP, AG, EMo, KFa, EP