Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB994 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 13, 2015      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB994 by Anchia (Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.), As Engrossed   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB994, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 13, 2015





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB994 by Anchia (Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB994 by Anchia (Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB994 by Anchia (Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.), As Engrossed

HB994 by Anchia (Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.), As Engrossed

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB994, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB994, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0    


2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromSchool Districts Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCounties Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromOther Special Districts   2016 $0 $0 $0 $0   2017 ($653,000) ($198,000) ($196,000) ($138,000)   2018 ($773,000) ($236,000) ($232,000) ($164,000)   2019 ($904,000) ($276,000) ($272,000) ($192,000)   2020 ($997,000) ($305,000) ($300,000) ($212,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromSchool Districts Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCounties Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromOther Special Districts   2016 $0 $0 $0 $0   2017 ($653,000) ($198,000) ($196,000) ($138,000)   2018 ($773,000) ($236,000) ($232,000) ($164,000)   2019 ($904,000) ($276,000) ($272,000) ($192,000)   2020 ($997,000) ($305,000) ($300,000) ($212,000)  


2016 $0 $0 $0 $0
2017 ($653,000) ($198,000) ($196,000) ($138,000)
2018 ($773,000) ($236,000) ($232,000) ($164,000)
2019 ($904,000) ($276,000) ($272,000) ($192,000)
2020 ($997,000) ($305,000) ($300,000) ($212,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 11 of the Tax Code, regarding taxable property and exemptions, to repeal sections 11.311(a) and (d) of the Tax Code. The sections that would be repealed provide that the exemption for landfill-generated gas conversion facilities applies only to facilities existing on January 1, 2014, and that the exemption expires on December 31, 2015. This bill would take effect January 1, 2016.

Methodology

The bill's repeal of the expiration of the property tax exemption for certain landfill-generated gas conversion facilities would generate a cost for local taxing units. There would be no cost to the state through the operation of the school funding formulas because this exemption is not deducted in the Comptroller's Property Value Study (school districts are not held harmless for any part of their revenue loss). The estimate was based on information from the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and from appraisal districts. The value loss to landfill-generated conversion facilities that are currently operating was estimated, four additional exempt properties per year were included, and projected tax rates were applied through the five-year projection period to estimate the tax revenue loss to special districts, cities and counties, and school districts.

Local Government Impact

The estimated fiscal implication to units of local government is reflected in the above table.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, KK, SD, SJS

 UP, KK, SD, SJS