Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB994 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anchia, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 994
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 1; May 15, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 994 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property used
 to collect, process, and deliver landfill-generated gas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 11.311(a) and (d), Tax Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 11.311, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.311.  [TEMPORARY EXEMPTION:] LANDFILL-GENERATED GAS
 CONVERSION FACILITIES.
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.311, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission shall develop rules to determine the
 value of the exemption granted under Subsection (b). The rules must
 limit the value of the exemption to only the value of the equipment
 used as business personal property on which gas is collected.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *