Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB995 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

                    By: González (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 995
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of stormwater control and recapture
 planning authorities in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 12, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 391A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 391A. STORMWATER CONTROL AND RECAPTURE PLANNING
 AUTHORITIES IN CERTAIN COUNTIES
 Sec. 391A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Affected county" means a county that:
 (A)  has a population of 800,000 or more; and
 (B)  receives an average annual rainfall of 15
 inches or less based on the most recent 10-year period according to
 data available from a reliable source, including the United States
 Department of Agriculture Natural Resources Conservation Service
 or the PRISM Climate Group, Oregon State University.
 (2)  "Authority" means a commission established under
 this chapter.
 Sec. 391A.002.  ESTABLISHMENT. (a) A stormwater control and
 recapture planning authority is established in each affected county
 in this state.
 (b)  An authority is a political subdivision of this state.
 Sec. 391A.003.  TERRITORY. The territory of an authority
 includes all of the territory in the affected county in which the
 authority is located except any territory within the boundaries or
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of that county's largest
 municipality, provided that the municipality has a plan in place
 for the control of stormwater on the date the authority is
 established.
 Sec. 391A.004.  BOARD OF DIRECTORS. The governing body of an
 authority is a board of directors composed of:
 (1)  a representative of the county in which the
 authority is located and each municipality within the territory of
 the authority;
 (2)  a representative of each water utility within the
 territory of the authority not also described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  a representative of each water district within the
 territory of the authority that has been in operation for at least
 15 years; and
 (4)  each member of the state legislature whose
 legislative district is wholly or partly in the territory of the
 authority.
 Sec. 391A.005.  POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) An authority shall:
 (1)  coordinate and adopt a long-range master plan to
 facilitate the development and management of integrated stormwater
 control and recapture projects and facilities within the
 authority's territory;
 (2)  apply for, accept, and receive gifts, grants,
 loans, and other money available from any source, including the
 state, the federal government, and an entity represented on the
 board of directors under Sections 391A.004(1), (2), and (3), to
 perform its purposes; and
 (3)  assist an entity represented on the board of
 directors under Sections 391A.004(1), (2), and (3) in carrying out
 an objective included in the authority's master plan.
 (b)  The authority may:
 (1)  enter into contracts as necessary to carry out the
 authority's powers and duties; and
 (2)  employ staff and consult with and retain experts.
 (c)  The authority may not:
 (1)  impose a tax or issue bonds; or
 (2)  regulate the structures or facilities of an
 electric utility as "electric utility" is defined by Section
 31.002, Utilities Code.
 Sec. 391A.006.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER.  This chapter expires
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *