Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR85 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Wray (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.C.R. No. 85
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Texas Legislative Medal of Honor was established
 to recognize gallant and intrepid service by a member of the state
 or federal military forces, and U.S. Navy Chief Petty Officer Chris
 Kyle, the most successful sniper in U.S. military history, proved
 himself a deserving recipient of this prestigious award; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Odessa on April 8, 1974, Christopher Scott
 Kyle learned patience and marksmanship at an early age; his father
 bought him a rifle when he was eight, and he hunted on the family
 ranch for pheasant and deer; after high school, he worked as a ranch
 hand and a professional rodeo rider until he was injured; despite
 the pins in his arm from his rodeo injuries, he actively sought to
 serve his nation, and thanks to his grit and determination, he was
 accepted into the elite Navy SEALs unit in 1999; and
 WHEREAS, Chief Petty Officer Kyle served four tours of duty
 in Iraq as a member of SEAL Team 3, and he fought in every major
 battle of Operation Iraqi Freedom, including engagements in Ramadi,
 Fallujah, and Baghdad; working in hot, dirty, and dangerous
 conditions, Chief Kyle put himself in harm's way on a daily basis,
 setting up his sniper's post in abandoned buildings, sometimes for
 as long as five weeks at a time, watching tirelessly through his
 scope for enemy combatants and, through his efforts, saving
 countless American lives; and
 WHEREAS, Known by his peers as "the Legend" for his uncanny
 skill, Chief Kyle often successfully took long-range shots, and in
 Sadr City in 2008, after he spotted an insurgent approaching an army
 convoy with a rocket launcher, he shot the man from a distance of
 2,100 yards, or 1.2 miles; as feared by the enemy as he was
 celebrated by his fellow Americans, Chief Kyle was nicknamed
 Al-Shaitan Ramadi, or "The Devil of Ramadi," by the insurgents, who
 put an $80,000 price on his head; and
 WHEREAS, Chief Kyle regularly demonstrated conspicuous
 gallantry in the thick of combat; during the second battle for
 Fallujah in November 2004, two Marines and two journalists were
 trapped near a heavily fortified enemy position, and as the Marines
 around him provided covering fire, Chief Kyle dashed through enemy
 fire, joined the trapped men, and provided suppressing fire to
 enable them to escape; then, as he made his own escape, he
 discovered one of the Marines wounded in the road, and, with enemy
 rounds thudding all around him, he grabbed his wounded comrade by
 his body armor and dragged him 50 yards to safety; he then returned
 to the battle until the last enemy insurgent was killed; and
 WHEREAS, Chief Kyle's bravery that day earned him one of his
 five Bronze Stars with Valor, and he also received two Silver Stars
 along with many other decorations; he was shot twice and survived
 six IED explosions, and by the time he left the navy to return to his
 family in Texas in 2009, he was credited with the highest number of
 confirmed kills in U.S. military history; and
 WHEREAS, Chief Kyle continued to distinguish himself in
 civilian life, running a security training company and publishing a
 best-selling combat memoir, which inspired an award-winning motion
 picture; he worked with the FITCO Cares Foundation to provide
 support to disabled veterans, and, tragically, he died while trying
 to help another veteran; such was the respect and admiration he had
 earned from his fellow Texans that his funeral procession from
 Midlothian to Austin stretched for more than 200 miles, one of the
 longest memorial processions in American history; and
 WHEREAS, Chris Kyle repeatedly risked his life to save the
 lives of his fellow soldiers and to advance their mission, and for
 his remarkable heroism he is most assuredly deserving of this
 state's supreme military award; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby direct the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously
 award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Christopher Scott
 Kyle in recognition of his valiant service during Operation Iraqi
 Freedom.
 * * * * *