Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR87 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 87


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may
 comfort those saddened by the death of Gene Earl Parker of Amarillo
 on September 19, 2014, at the age of 76; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 24, 1938, in Tahoka, Gene Parker was the
 ninth of 10 children born to John and Patriel Parker; after
 graduating from Happy High School in 1956, he went on to attend West
 Texas State College, and he earned a bachelor's degree and a
 master's degree in Spanish and educational administration; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Parker worked for the Shamrock Oil Company for a
 brief time before embarking on a career as an educator with the
 Edgewood Independent School District in the mid-1960s; he taught in
 the Sunray Independent School District for several years, and in
 1972, he became the superintendent of schools for the Wildorado
 Independent School District; named the director of career planning
 and placement at West Texas State University in 1974, he spent
 nearly two decades in that position until his retirement in 1993;
 and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan served three terms as a Randall
 County commissioner, and during that time, he played an
 instrumental role in the establishment of the Texas Panhandle War
 Memorial in Amarillo; he also shared his time and talents with a
 number of civic organizations, including the United Way of Amarillo
 and Canyon, the Amarillo Chamber of Commerce, the Texas Aviation
 Historical Society Board, the Panhandle Judges and Commissioners
 Association, and the Panhandle Plains Higher Education Authority; a
 man of faith, he was an active member of the congregation at
 Paramount Baptist Church, where he taught Sunday school for many
 years; and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Mr. Parker was blessed with
 the love and support of his wife, Peggy, with whom he shared more
 than 54 years; together, they raised four children, Del, Carmen,
 Pam, and Mitch, and later welcomed into their family five
 grandchildren; in addition to playing games with his grandkids,
 Mr. Parker enjoyed working on the family farm, flying planes, and
 square dancing; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known Gene Parker
 will remember the way he touched their lives with his generosity and
 optimism, and he will forever hold a treasured place in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Gene Earl Parker and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Peggy
 Parker; to his daughter, Pam Barrett, and her husband, Jay; to his
 son, Mitch Parker, and his wife, Kate; to his grandchildren,
 Parker, Jeron, and Trey Barrett, and Charlotte and Will Parker; to
 his sisters, Irene Hopper and Ruth Barrett; to his brothers, Johnny
 Parker and his wife, Verbie, and Don Parker and his wife, Jeane; and
 to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Gene Earl Parker.
 Smithee
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 87 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 87 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 7, 2015, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor