Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR43 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 6, 2015      TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HJR43 by Raymond (Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.), As Introduced    No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated, other than the cost of publication. The cost to the state for publication of the resolution is $118,681.  The resolution would propose an amendment to Article VIII of the Texas Constitution, to add new Section 26 to prohibit sales taxation of prescription medicine that was not subject to taxation under Chapter 151 of the Tax Code on January 1, 2015. The resolution would provide that a general law enacted by the 84th Legislature, but prohibited by the new Section 26 of Article VIII of the Texas Constitution, would expire January 1, 2017. The proposed constitutional amendment would be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015, and would be effective thereafter if approved. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:304 Comptroller of Public Accounts   LBB Staff:  UP, KK, SD    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 6, 2015





  TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HJR43 by Raymond (Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HJR43 by Raymond (Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.), As Introduced

 Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HJR43 by Raymond (Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.), As Introduced

HJR43 by Raymond (Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.), As Introduced



No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated, other than the cost of publication. The cost to the state for publication of the resolution is $118,681.

No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated, other than the cost of publication. The cost to the state for publication of the resolution is $118,681.



The resolution would propose an amendment to Article VIII of the Texas Constitution, to add new Section 26 to prohibit sales taxation of prescription medicine that was not subject to taxation under Chapter 151 of the Tax Code on January 1, 2015. The resolution would provide that a general law enacted by the 84th Legislature, but prohibited by the new Section 26 of Article VIII of the Texas Constitution, would expire January 1, 2017. The proposed constitutional amendment would be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015, and would be effective thereafter if approved.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, KK, SD

 UP, KK, SD