Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR48 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/26/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R2497 TJB-F
 By: Harless H.J.R. No. 48


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment limiting the permissible uses
 of the state highway fund, including further limiting the use of
 additional tax and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain
 state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public
 highway purposes.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsections (d) and (e)
 of this section and subject [Subject] to legislative appropriation,
 allocation and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing
 law;] provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue
 from the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School
 Fund; and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by
 counties from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less
 than the maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and
 the percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws
 in effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 (b)  For a biennium, the Legislature may not appropriate
 funds derived from the revenue described by Subsection (a) of this
 section or Section 7-b of this article for a purpose other than
 acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing, constructing, or
 maintaining public roadways in an amount that exceeds the lesser
 of:
 (1)  the total amount of those funds appropriated for a
 purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing,
 constructing, or maintaining public roadways in the preceding
 biennium; or
 (2)  the amount determined under Subsection (c) of this
 section.
 (c)  For each biennium, the maximum amount that may be
 appropriated as provided by Subsection (b) of this section is
 reduced by 20 percent from the preceding biennium if the estimate of
 anticipated revenue from all sources made in advance of the regular
 session under Section 49a(a), Article III, of this constitution for
 the biennium exceeds the total amount of revenue from all sources
 for the preceding biennium by more than three times the amount of
 the reduction.
 (d)  All net revenue deposited to the credit of the state
 highway fund, as required by this section or by general law, that is
 attributable to all or part of the following sources shall be
 deposited to the credit of a special account in that fund:
 (1)  the state sales and use tax imposed on motor
 vehicles by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor;
 (2)  the taxes imposed on gasoline and diesel fuel used
 to propel motor vehicles on the public roadways attributable to the
 portion of the tax rates in excess of 20 cents for each net gallon or
 fractional part on which the gasoline or diesel fuel tax is imposed;
 (3)  registration fees imposed on motorcycles and
 mopeds by Section 502.251, Transportation Code, or its successor,
 attributable to the portion of the rate of those fees that exceeds
 the rate in effect on August 31, 2015;
 (4)  registration fees imposed on vehicles that weigh
 6,000 pounds or less by Section 502.252, Transportation Code, or
 its successor, and other vehicles to which that section applies,
 attributable to the portion of the rate of those fees that exceeds
 the rate in effect on August 31, 2015;
 (5)  registration fees imposed on vehicles that weigh
 more than 6,000 pounds by Section 502.253, Transportation Code, or
 its successor, and other vehicles to which that section applies,
 attributable to the portion of the rates of those fees that exceed
 the rates in effect on August 31, 2015;
 (6)  registration fees imposed on trailers, travel
 trailers, and semitrailers by Section 502.254, Transportation
 Code, or its successor, attributable to the portion of the rate of
 those fees that exceeds the rate in effect on August 31, 2015; and
 (7)  the revenue from any other tax, fee, or charge not
 previously dedicated to the state highway fund that is dedicated to
 that fund by an act of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015.
 (e)  Interest earned on the account under Subsection (d) of
 this section in the state highway fund shall be credited to the
 account. Revenue allocated to the account and interest on the
 revenue may be used only for acquiring rights-of-way and planning,
 designing, constructing, and maintaining nontolled public
 roadways.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, to limit the permissible uses of the state
 highway fund, including further limiting the use of additional tax
 and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain state taxes and
 fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public highway purposes.
 (b)  Sections 7-a(b) and (c), Article VIII, of this
 constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium
 that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Sections 7-a(d) and (e), Article VIII, of this
 constitution take effect January 1, 2016.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment limiting the
 permissible uses of the state highway fund, including further
 limiting the use of additional tax and fee revenue attributable to
 changes to certain state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for
 nontolled public highway purposes."