Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1679 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 1679


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Jacksonville lost an admired
 community leader and friend with the passing of Mayor Kenneth
 Melvin on December 2, 2014, at the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Melvin was born in Lindale on May 8, 1940, to
 Cosby Ray and Ocie Algerine Melvin; he graduated from Lindale High
 School and went on to attend Tyler Junior College, The University of
 Texas at Tyler, and Dallas Business School; on May 28, 1959, he
 married Fredia Nell Glaze, and they shared more than 55 years
 together while lovingly raising a daughter, Ginger; and
 WHEREAS, This lifelong Texan started his career as an
 assistant manager and manager for various retailers in East Texas;
 in 1969, he opened his own grocery business, which he sold in 1977
 when he began employment with Southwestern Electric Service Company
 in Jacksonville; following 32 years of service, he retired from his
 position as comptroller of the company's business department; and
 WHEREAS, After completing a training class in Hot Springs,
 Arkansas, in 1970, Mr. Melvin also enjoyed work as a professional
 square dance caller; he performed this role at the Jack & Jill Dance
 Club in Jacksonville and numerous other dance halls around Texas,
 and he was a guest caller for clubs as far away as Canada and CancĂșn;
 moreover, he served his peers in a number of offices, including
 president of the East Texas Callers Association and vice president
 of the Texas State Callers' Association, and he was the featured
 caller at several state festivals; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Melvin's interest in civic affairs led him to
 join the Jacksonville City Council in 2005; he was elected mayor in
 2011, and he held that office until the time of his passing; during
 his tenure with the city, he worked to encourage cooperation in
 efforts to better the community for all residents, and his business
 acumen and attention to detail were appreciated by those on the
 council who had the pleasure of working with him; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to his professional accomplishments,
 Mayor Melvin volunteered for more than a decade with Hospice of East
 Texas; he was also a member of the First United Methodist Church in
 Jacksonville; and
 WHEREAS, Held in high esteem by all who knew him, Kenneth
 Melvin built a life that was rich in family, friends, and meaningful
 achievements, and he will be fondly remembered and deeply missed;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of the Honorable
 Kenneth Melvin and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Fredia Nell Glaze Melvin; to his daughter,
 Ginger Nell Melvin Mees; to his grandchildren, Benjamin Joseph Mees
 and his wife, Sammie Jo, Andrew Brady Melvin, and Melody Kay Melvin;
 to his great-grandson, Brady James Mees; to his siblings, Martha
 Rae Phillips and Douglas and Joe Melvin; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Kenneth
 Melvin.
 Clardy
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1679 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House