Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR192 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 192


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Dr. Willis Thomas Jones Jr. of Baytown is deserving
 of highest commendation for the valiant service he rendered to his
 state and his nation during World War II; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Jones enlisted in the U.S. Army Air Forces in
 November 1941, just one month prior to the Japanese attack on Pearl
 Harbor; he attended flight school and graduated from Armor School
 in April 1942, at which time he was commissioned a second
 lieutenant; shortly thereafter, he was assigned to one of the first
 B-17 bomber groups to head to England for the war; in the fall of
 1942, his unit was detached from the VIII Bomber Command in England
 and sent to serve in the North African campaign, which culminated in
 the surrender of the Axis forces under General Erwin Rommel in May
 1943; Dr. Jones was subsequently assigned to the 15th Air Force and
 based in Italy, where he arrived on December 25, 1943; after flying
 numerous missions as a gunner, he assumed the role of bombardier;
 and
 WHEREAS, On July 26, 1944, while Dr. Jones was flying his
 45th combat mission of the war, his bomber squadron was attacked by
 a group of German fighters over Vienna, Austria; the assault
 destroyed his plane and killed the crew's pilot, copilot, and
 engineer, but Dr. Jones was able to bail out of the aircraft at
 22,000 feet, after all remaining crew members had ejected; although
 miraculously unharmed, he was quickly captured by enemy forces and
 taken to the Stalag Luft I prisoner of war camp near Barth, Germany;
 there, he endured several months of imprisonment, until the camp
 was liberated by Russian forces in May 1945; Dr. Jones was
 discharged from the military with the rank of major in 1946; and
 WHEREAS, Following his return home to the Lone Star State,
 W. T. Jones married his wife, Ada Mae, on August 25, 1945, and the
 couple has since shared nearly seven rewarding decades together;
 Dr. Jones went on to attend medical school from 1946 to 1950, and he
 enjoyed a long and successful career in Baytown until his
 retirement in 1985; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. W. T. Jones embodies the highest ideals of the
 U.S. armed forces and deserves the lasting respect and gratitude of
 all Americans, and it is a privilege to commend him for his
 outstanding contributions to his country and his community; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby honor Dr. Willis Thomas Jones Jr. for his brave
 and steadfast service in this nation's behalf; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Dr. Jones as an expression of high regard by the Texas
 House of Representatives.
 Smith
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 192 was adopted by the House on
 February 19, 2015, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House