Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR3259 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/02/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 3259


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Gerald W. Bolfing of Waco on May 11, 2015, at the age of
 86; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Waco on August 31, 1928, to Robert E. and
 Helen Ann Bolfing, Gerald Bolfing graduated from Waco High School
 in 1945; he and the former Patsy Oakes exchanged wedding vows on
 June 20, 1949, and they shared 27 rewarding years together until her
 passing; fortunate enough to find love again, Mr. Bolfing married
 Mary Jo Streit in February 1990; he was the father of four children,
 Patty, Michael Ann, Gerald, and John, and he eventually knew the joy
 of welcoming into his family 2 stepchildren, Bradley and Susan, 17
 grandchildren, and 10 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, After working in his father's store for many years,
 Mr. Bolfing opened Bolfing's Food Store in Lacy-Lakeview with his
 brother; he went on to found an oil and gas company, which
 eventually became Magnum Hunter Resources, a New York Stock
 Exchange company; in addition, he shared his time and talents with a
 number of area organizations, and he served on the boards of
 Affiliated Foods and Friends for Life; and
 WHEREAS, Gerald Bolfing was a kind and generous friend and a
 significant asset to his community, and he leaves behind a record of
 service that his loved ones can remember with pride; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Gerald W. Bolfing and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Mary Jo Bolfing; to his children, Patty Fulbright and her
 husband, Ed, Michael Ann Bolfing, Gerald Bolfing and his wife,
 Kimberly, and John Bolfing and his wife, Gailey; to his stepson,
 Bradley Streit, and his wife, Suzi; to his grandchildren, Jeremy
 Fulbright, Zachary Fulbright and his wife, Tiffany, Jacob Fulbright
 and his wife, Jana, Jennifer Fulbright, Emily Bolfing-Donohoo,
 Beau, Shelby Jo, Molly, Tyler, Brooke, Joshua, and Brock Bolfing,
 Rachel Milstead and her husband, Dylan, Garrett Blount and his
 wife, Traci, Christopher Streit and his wife, Abby, Connor Streit,
 and Don Bearden and his wife, Coty; to his 10 great-grandchildren;
 to his siblings, Robert Bolfing, Helen Marie Pryor, and Margie
 Anderson and her husband, Hal; and to his many other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Gerald W.
 Bolfing.
 Anderson of McLennan
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 3259 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 30, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House