Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR406 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 406


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may
 temper the profound sadness felt by the loved ones of Keith Everest
 Friend of Grapevine, who passed away on November 8, 2014, at the age
 of 48; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Pat and Julie Friend on September 8, 1966,
 Keith Friend graduated from L. D. Bell High School in Hurst and went
 on to attend Texas State University in San Marcos; he married Lori,
 his high school sweetheart, on July 8, 1989, and the couple settled
 in Grapevine, where they raised their children, Amber and Andrew;
 and
 WHEREAS, A longtime employee of IBM, Mr. Friend was also an
 active volunteer scout leader and committee member with Boy Scout
 Troop 905 in Colleyville, and he was a former den leader for Cub
 Scout Pack 817 in Grapevine; he encouraged his young charges to
 participate in all aspects of the Boy Scout life and motivated them
 to set and achieve personal goals, and through his example, he
 showed them how to be a caring friend and a dedicated leader; even
 as he battled cancer during the last six and a half years of his
 life, he maintained a positive attitude and continued to be
 involved in scouting activities; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to his volunteer efforts with the Boy
 Scouts, Mr. Friend enjoyed playing the guitar and sharing his
 musical knowledge with beginning players; he also worked with the
 youth at his church for many years, and he served as a compassionate
 mentor to fellow cancer patients, lending them a sympathetic ear
 and reminding them that they were not alone in their struggles; he
 was unfailingly generous with his time, but most of all, he
 treasured the moments he spent with his loved ones, whose days were
 made brighter by his warmth, humor, and affection; and
 WHEREAS, Although his days on this earth were far too few,
 Keith Friend left an indelible mark in the lives of numerous others,
 and his devotion to his family and to the youth of his community
 will forever inspire all those who had the good fortune to know him;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Keith Everest
 Friend and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Lori Friend; to his children, Amber and Andrew Friend;
 to his parents, Julie Mason and Pat Friend; to his sister, Elaine
 Christine Lincoln; and to his other relatives, his scout family,
 and all who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Keith
 Friend.
 Capriglione
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 406 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 19, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House