Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1032 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2015

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1032
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2015; March 11, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 3; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authority for certain state employees to work flexible
 hours and to work from home or other authorized alternative work
 sites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 658.006, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 658.006.  VARIED [STAGGERED] WORKING HOURS.
 (a)  Normal working hours for employees of a state agency may be
 staggered for traffic regulation or public safety.
 (b)  An employee who works from an alternative work site as
 part of a policy approved under Section 658.010 may, with the
 approval of the employee's supervisor, complete all or part of the
 employee's working hours, including compensatory time and
 overtime, at times other than the regular working hours established
 under Section 658.005.
 SECTION 2.  Section 658.010, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 employee's personal residence may not be considered the employee's
 regular or assigned temporary place of employment without prior
 written authorization from the administrative head of the employing
 state agency.
 (c)  The administrative head of a state agency may adopt an
 agency policy that authorizes the supervisor of an employee of the
 agency to permit the employee to work from an alternative work site,
 including the employee's residence, as the employee's regular or
 assigned temporary place of employment.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *