Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1034 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1034
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2015; March 11, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of canceling an annual application
 for a ballot to be voted by mail to subsequent elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 84, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 84.038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 84.038.  CANCELLATION EFFECTIVE FOR SINGLE ELECTION FOR
 CERTAIN VOTERS. The cancellation of an application for a ballot to
 be voted by mail under Section 84.032(c), (d), or (e) does not
 cancel the application with respect to a subsequent election to
 which the same application applies under Section 86.0015(b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *