Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1034 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1034


 AN ACT
 relating to voting by mail, including the cancellation of an
 application for a ballot to be voted by mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 84, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 84.038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 84.038.  CANCELLATION EFFECTIVE FOR SINGLE ELECTION FOR
 CERTAIN VOTERS. The cancellation of an application for a ballot to
 be voted by mail under Section 84.032(c), (d), or (e) does not
 cancel the application with respect to a subsequent election to
 which the same application applies under Section 86.0015(b).
 SECTION 2.  Section 86.0015, Subsection (b), Election Code,
 is amended by adding a new Section (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  A person eligible to submit an application under
 this section may apply to receive all ballots in an even numbered
 year on the same application submitted for a ballot in the November
 general election of an odd year.
 SECTION 3.  Section 86.013(d), Election Code, is amended by
 adding a new Subsection (6) to read as follows:
 (6)  The secretary of state by rule may redesign the
 official carrier envelope by moving all the requirements of (1)
 through (5) to a separate sheet and styling the signature box to
 insure that a voter is instructed to and must sign over the flap.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1034 passed the Senate on
 May 8, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1034 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, zero present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor