Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1041 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2015

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1041
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2015; March 11, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 6, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 1;
 May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to required disclosures in ballot proposition language
 authorizing political subdivisions to issue bonds or impose or
 change a tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.072, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (e) and
 any other requirement imposed by law for a proposition, including a
 provision prescribing the proposition language, a proposition
 submitted to the voters for approval of the issuance of bonds or the
 imposition, increase, or reduction of a tax shall for any political
 subdivision, including municipalities, counties, school districts,
 and special taxing districts, specifically state, as applicable:
 (1)  with respect to a proposition seeking voter
 approval of the issuance of bonds:
 (A)  the total amount of the political
 subdivision's debt currently outstanding;
 (B)  the total amount of the political
 subdivision's current debt payments;
 (C)  the amount of taxes required to be imposed on
 a homestead with a value equal to the median homestead value in the
 political subdivision, as computed by the appraisal district, to
 repay the political subdivision's current debt obligations; and
 (D)  the estimated tax burden that would be
 imposed on a homestead with a value equal to the median homestead
 value in the political subdivision, as computed by the appraisal
 district, to repay the bonds to be authorized, if approved;
 (2)  with respect to a proposition that only seeks
 voter approval of the imposition or increase of a tax:
 (A)  the estimated additional tax burden that
 would be imposed on a homestead with a value equal to the median
 homestead value in the political subdivision, as computed by the
 appraisal district, after the imposition or increase of the tax, if
 approved; and
 (B)  a detailed description of the purposes for
 which the tax is to be imposed or increased, if approved; or
 (3)  with respect to a proposition that only seeks
 voter approval of the reduction of a tax, the estimated tax
 reduction for a homestead with a value equal to the median homestead
 value in the political subdivision, as computed by the appraisal
 district, if the reduction of the tax is approved.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a ballot for an election ordered on or after the effective date of
 this Act. An election ordered before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect when the election was ordered, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *