Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1056 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1056
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2015; March 16, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 13, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility for indigent status for purposes of the
 driver responsibility program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 708.158(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall waive all surcharges assessed
 under this chapter for a person who is indigent.  For the purposes
 of this section, a person is considered to be indigent if the
 person:
 (1)  was determined to be indigent for the purpose of
 appointing counsel under Article 26.04, Code of Criminal Procedure,
 for the offense that is the basis for the surcharge, and the court
 did not make a subsequent finding that the person had the ability to
 pay, wholly or partly, the cost of the appointed counsel; or
 (2)  provides the evidence described by Subsection (b)
 to the court.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 708.158, Transportation Code, applies to a surcharge pending on the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of when the surcharge was
 assessed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *