Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1066 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1066
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2015; March 16, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 25, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuing eligibility requirements for institutions
 of higher education to participate in the Texas Science,
 Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (T-STEM) Challenge
 Scholarship Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.9794(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  To maintain eligibility, each year beginning with the
 third [second] year following implementation of a scholarship
 program under this subchapter, an institution must demonstrate to
 the board that at least 70 percent of the institution's T-STEM
 Challenge Scholarship recipients [graduates], within twelve
 [three] months of receipt of a scholarship [after graduation], are:
 (1)  employed [by a business in a Science, Technology,
 Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) field]; or
 (2)  enrolled in [upper-division] courses leading to a
 certificate, associate, or baccalaureate degree in a Science,
 Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) field.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall award scholarships under Subchapter GG, Chapter 61, Education
 Code, as amended by this Act, beginning with the 2015-2016 academic
 year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *