Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1071 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1071
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2015; March 16, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 7, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1071 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring notice of the scheduling of an execution date
 and the issuance of a warrant of execution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 43.141, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  The attorney representing the state must ensure that a
 copy of the state's motion to set an execution date is served on the
 attorney who represented the condemned person in the most recently
 concluded stage of a state or federal postconviction proceeding.
 (b-2)  If the convicting court intends to set an execution
 date under this article on its own motion, the clerk of the
 convicting court must provide written notice of that intent to:
 (1)  the attorney who represented the condemned person
 in the most recently concluded stage of a state or federal
 postconviction proceeding;
 (2)  the attorney representing the state; and
 (3)  the office of capital writs established under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 78, Government Code.
 (b-3)  A copy served or notice provided under Subsection
 (b-1) or (b-2) must be:
 (1)  personally delivered not later than the 10th day
 before the day on which the court enters an order setting the
 execution date; or
 (2)  sent by first class mail and deposited in the mail
 not later than the 16th day before the day on which the court enters
 an order setting the execution date.
 SECTION 2.  Article 43.15, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 43.15.  WARRANT OF EXECUTION. (a)  Whenever any person
 is sentenced to death, the clerk of the court in which the sentence
 is pronounced[,] shall, not later than the 10th day [within ten
 days] after the court enters its order setting the date for
 execution, issue a warrant under the seal of the court for the
 execution of the sentence of death, which shall recite the fact of
 conviction, setting forth specifically the offense, the judgment of
 the court, and the time fixed for the [his] execution, and which
 shall be directed to the director of the correctional institutions
 division of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice [Director of
 the Department of Corrections] at Huntsville, Texas, commanding the
 director [him] to proceed, at the time and place named in the order
 of execution, to carry the same into execution, as provided in [the
 preceding] Article 43.14, and shall deliver such warrant to the
 sheriff of the county in which such judgment of conviction was had,
 to be [by him] delivered by the sheriff to the director [said
 Director of the Department of Corrections], together with the
 condemned person if the person [he] has not previously been so
 delivered.
 (b)  At the time the warrant is issued under Subsection (a),
 the clerk of the court shall send a copy of the warrant to:
 (1)  the attorney who represented the condemned person
 in the most recently concluded stage of a state or federal
 postconviction proceeding;
 (2)  the attorney representing the state; and
 (3)  the office of capital writs established under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 78, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Article 43.141, Code of Criminal Procedure,
 as amended by this Act, applies only to an order entered on or after
 the effective date of this Act.  An order entered before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the order was entered, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Article 43.15, Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a warrant issued on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  A warrant issued before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the warrant was
 issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *