S.B. No. 1115 AN ACT relating to a program allowing certain military voters on active duty overseas to cast a ballot electronically. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 105.004(b), (c), (d), and (e), Election Code, are amended to read as follows: (b) The secretary of state shall select to participate in the program a number of counties as determined by the secretary of state [one county] that: (1) desire [desires] to participate in the program; and (2) are [is] determined by the secretary of state to have the appropriate technological capabilities. (c) The secretary of state shall operate the program established under Subsection (a) as a pilot program until September 1, 2017 [2015]. (d) Not later than January 1, 2017 [2015], the secretary of state shall file a report with the legislature. The report may include the secretary of state's recommendations on the future use of e-mail ballot submission by members of the armed forces of the United States and suggestions for permanent statutory authority regarding e-mail ballot submission by members of the armed forces of the United States. (e) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2015]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1115 passed the Senate on April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1115 passed the House on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 1, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor