Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1117 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1117
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2015; March 16, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 30, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1117 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to housing services provided through the transitional
 living services program to certain children in the conservatorship
 of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.121, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The department shall ensure that the transition plan for
 each youth 16 years of age or older includes provisions to assist
 the youth in managing the youth's housing needs after the youth
 leaves foster care, including provisions that:
 (1)  identify the cost of housing in relation to the
 youth's sources of income, including any benefits or rental
 assistance available to the youth;
 (2)  if the youth's housing goals include residing with
 family or friends, state that the department has addressed the
 following with the youth:
 (A)  the length of time the youth expects to stay
 in the housing arrangement;
 (B)  expectations for the youth regarding paying
 rent and meeting other household obligations;
 (C)  the youth's psychological and emotional
 needs, as applicable; and
 (D)  any potential conflicts with other household
 members, or any difficulties connected to the type of housing the
 youth is seeking, that may arise based on the youth's psychological
 and emotional needs;
 (3)  inform the youth about emergency shelters and
 housing resources, including supervised independent living and
 housing at colleges and universities, such as dormitories;
 (4)  require the department to review a common rental
 application with the youth and ensure that the youth possesses all
 of the documentation required to obtain rental housing; and
 (5)  identify any individuals who are able to serve as
 cosigners or references on the youth's applications for housing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *