Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB112 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 112


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a magistrate to prohibit certain
 communications in an order for emergency protection; amending
 provisions subject to a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 17.292(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The magistrate in the order for emergency protection may
 prohibit the arrested party from:
 (1)  committing:
 (A)  family violence or an assault on the person
 protected under the order; or
 (B)  an act in furtherance of an offense under
 Section 42.072, Penal Code;
 (2)  communicating:
 (A)  directly with a member of the family or
 household or with the person protected under the order in a
 threatening or harassing manner; [or]
 (B)  a threat through any person to a member of the
 family or household or to the person protected under the order; or
 (C)  if the magistrate finds good cause, in any
 manner with a person protected under the order or a member of the
 family or household of a person protected under the order, except
 through the party's attorney or a person appointed by the court;
 (3)  going to or near:
 (A)  the residence, place of employment, or
 business of a member of the family or household or of the person
 protected under the order; or
 (B)  the residence, child care facility, or school
 where a child protected under the order resides or attends; or
 (4)  possessing a firearm, unless the person is a peace
 officer, as defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, actively engaged
 in employment as a sworn, full-time paid employee of a state agency
 or political subdivision.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 112 passed the Senate on
 April 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 112 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor