By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1200 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 17, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1200 By: Taylor of Galveston A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a commission to recommend a new system for student assessment and public school accountability. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 39, Education Code, is amended by adding Subchapter N to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER N. TEXAS COMMISSION ON NEXT GENERATION ASSESSMENTS AND ACCOUNTABILITY Sec. 39.501. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "commission" means the Texas Commission on Next Generation Assessments and Accountability. Sec. 39.502. TEXAS COMMISSION ON NEXT GENERATION ASSESSMENTS AND ACCOUNTABILITY. (a) The Texas Commission on Next Generation Assessments and Accountability is established to develop and make recommendations for new systems of student assessment and public school accountability. (b) The commission is composed of 15 members, consisting of the following: (1) four members appointed by the governor; (2) three members appointed by the lieutenant governor; (3) three members appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; (4) the chair of the senate committee on education, or a representative designated by the chair; (5) the chair of the senate committee on higher education, or a representative designated by the chair; (6) the chair of the house of representatives committee on public education, or a representative designated by the chair; (7) the chair of the house of representatives committee on higher education, or a representative designated by the chair; and (8) a member of the State Board of Education, as designated by the chair of that board. (c) In making appointments under Subsections (b)(1), (2), and (3), the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the commission includes at least one of each of the following representatives: (1) a parent or person standing in parental relation to a student enrolled in the public school system; (2) an educator in the public school system; (3) an educator in a school district that is a participant in the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium under Section 7.0561; (4) a member of the business community; (5) a member of the civic community; (6) a leader in student assessment development and use; and (7) a leader in research concerning student assessment and education outcomes. Sec. 39.503. PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall designate the presiding officer of the commission. Sec. 39.504. COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of the commission is not entitled to compensation for service on the commission but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing commission duties. Sec. 39.505. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT AND FUNDING. (a) Staff members of the agency shall provide administrative support for the commission. (b) Funding for the administrative and operational expenses of the commission shall be provided by appropriation to the agency for that purpose. Sec. 39.506. RECOMMENDATIONS. The commission shall develop recommendations under this subchapter to address: (1) the purpose of a state accountability system and the role of student assessment in that system; (2) opportunities to assess students that: (A) provide actionable information for a parent or person standing in parental relation to a student, an educator, and the public; (B) support learning activities; (C) recognize application of skills and knowledge; (D) measure student educational growth toward mastery; and (E) value critical thinking; (3) alignment of state performance standards with college and career readiness requirements in collaboration with the Texas Workforce Commission and Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board; (4) policy changes necessary to enable a student to progress through subject matter and grade levels on demonstration of mastery; and (5) policy changes necessary to establish a student assessment and public school accountability system that meets state goals, is community based, promotes parent and community involvement, and reflects the unique needs of each community. Sec. 39.507. REPORT. (a) The commission shall prepare and deliver a report to the governor and the legislature that recommends statutory changes to improve systems of student assessment and public school accountability not later than September 1, 2016. (b) In preparing the report, the commission shall consider the recommendations of the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium established under Section 7.0561, including recommendations related to innovative, next-generation learning standards and assessment and accountability systems. Sec. 39.508. PUBLIC MEETINGS AND PUBLIC INFORMATION. (a) The commission may hold public meetings as needed to fulfill its duties under this subchapter. (b) The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552, Government Code. Sec. 39.509. COMMISSION ABOLISHED; EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) The commission is abolished January 1, 2017. (b) This subchapter expires January 1, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *