Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1210 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1210
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of amusement redemption machine game
 rooms in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 234.132, Local Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 1284 (H.B. 2123), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 234.132.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies only
 to:
 (1)  a county that has [with] a population of less than
 25,000, [that] is adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico, and is within 50
 miles of an international border;
 (2)  a county that has a population of four million or
 more; and
 (3)  a county that has a population of 550,000 or more
 and is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision (2).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 234, Local Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 1377 (H.B. 1127), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *