Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1228 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2015

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1228
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing children of Texas Alcoholic Beverage
 Commission employees to be employed by holders of licenses or
 permits issued by the commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.05, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, a child of a commission
 employee may be employed by the holder of a license or permit issued
 under this code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *