Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1235 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1235
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 24, 2015, rereferred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to defining the duties and to the penalties concerning
 pain management clinics.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 168.001, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 168.001.  DEFINITIONS [DEFINITION].  In this chapter:
 (1)  [In this chapter,] "Pain [pain] management clinic"
 means a publicly or privately owned facility for which a majority of
 patients are issued on a monthly basis a prescription for opioids,
 benzodiazepines, barbiturates, or carisoprodol, but not including
 suboxone.
 (2)  "Operator" means an owner, medical director, or
 physician affiliated or associated with the pain management clinic
 in any capacity.  Each of these individuals is considered to be
 operating at the pain management clinic.
 SECTION 2.  Section 168.201(d), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  A person who owns or operates a pain management clinic
 is engaged in the practice of medicine.  This shall include, but is
 not limited to, all supervision and delegation activities related
 to the pain management clinic.
 SECTION 3.  Section 168.202(c), Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A violation of this chapter is subject to criminal
 prosecution under Section 165.152.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *